THE WINGATE SPECIAL CHILDRENS TRUST

Charity number: 327713
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £247.49k £356.86k £275.76k £276.91k £363.82k
Total expenditure £248.31k £282.76k £296.73k £316.51k £289.43k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A