Financial history VIPASSANA TRUST

Charity number: 327798
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022
Total gross income £1.16m £967.39k £1.02m £667.34k £1.01m
Total expenditure £1.39m £1.04m £906.41k £665.65k £924.90k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £41.02k £6.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £1.09m £917.30k £973.60k £444.15k £933.67k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £163 £39 £122 £14 £1.42k
Income - Other £73.64k £50.05k £46.44k £223.18k £71.90k
Income - Legacies £0 £3.00k £0 £56.24k £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.39m £1.04m £906.41k £665.65k £924.90k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £4.42k £4.50k £4.57k £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0