Financial history DORIS FIELD CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 328687
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 15/08/2018 15/08/2019 15/08/2020 15/08/2021 15/08/2022
Total gross income £462.69k £467.68k £430.70k £413.69k £465.01k
Total expenditure £636.64k £547.56k £485.65k £499.70k £480.89k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A