Financial history ROYAL SCOTTISH COUNTRY DANCE SOCIETY (MILTON KEYNES)

Charity number: 1061836
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £3.03k £2.28k £2.96k £395 £1.96k
Total expenditure £3.14k £2.00k £3.16k £782 £1.84k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A