THE NORTH OF ENGLAND REFUGEE SERVICE LIMITED

Charity number: 1091200
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £588.68k £554.88k £562.68k £557.52k £594.57k
Total expenditure £611.70k £528.02k £552.77k £568.05k £585.31k
Income from government contracts £196.42k £0 N/A £6.38k £256.64k
Income from government grants £0 £21.00k £21.00k £18.90k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £19.43k £31.98k £5.14k £8.18k £5.90k
Income - Other trading activities £96.85k £0 £121.81k £122.70k £0
Income - Charitable activities £445.88k £508.78k £215.47k £406.32k £568.75k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £87 £50 £26 £347 £350
Income - Other £26.44k £14.07k £195.13k £19.99k £19.58k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £544.26k £489.62k £363.71k £335.69k £585.31k
Expenditure - Raising funds £64.82k £238 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £3.51k £3.12k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £2.62k £38.17k £189.06k £232.36k £0