THE NORTH OF ENGLAND REFUGEE SERVICE LIMITED

Charity number: 1091200
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Tessa Gray Trustee 01 July 2020 None on record
Fiona Ranson Trustee 04 September 2019 None on record
Josephine Mudzingwa Trustee 05 June 2019 None on record
Ibrahim Diallo Trustee 07 September 2016 None on record
Ann Veronica Schofield Trustee 30 November 2016
FERTILE GROUND DANCE LTD Received: On time
ELSWICK COMMUNITY POOL AND LEISURE CENTRE CIO Received: 81 days late
ROHINGYA ACTION NORTH EAST Overdue by 32 days
Chris Boyle Trustee 14 May 2020 None on record