ST MARY'S PRE-SCHOOL (SWANAGE)

Charity number: 1062936
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 03 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 03 November 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 03 November 2021 126 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 03 November 2021 126 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 28 September 2021 455 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 28 September 2021 455 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 28 September 2021 821 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 28 September 2021 821 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 20 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 20 March 2018 On time Download