ST MARY'S PRE-SCHOOL (SWANAGE)

Charity number: 1062936
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £81.13k £78.59k £40.69k £61.72k £44.64k
Total expenditure £75.46k £72.68k £62.96k £55.16k £45.64k
Income from government contracts £66.89k £69.59k £37.61k £49.33k £40.67k
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A