Financial history SUTTON CHENEY VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 1072482
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £2.11k £2.17k £3.02k £3.48k £2.55k
Total expenditure £1.58k £5.95k £2.69k £2.50k £4.32k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A