LONDON CATALYST

Charity number: 1066739
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MARK PALFRAMAN Trustee 02 July 2015
HACKNEY MIGRANT CENTRE Received: On time
Emma Whitby Trustee 07 December 2017 None on record
ANDREW CHARLES DAVIDSON Trustee 18 June 2013 None on record
Joan Major Trustee 06 June 2019 None on record
YASMIN HUSSAIN Trustee 07 March 2019 None on record
Dr SARAH DIVALL Chair 04 March 2015 None on record
DANNY DALY Trustee 07 March 2019 None on record
PHILIPPE ALBERT GRANGER Trustee 04 December 2014 None on record