Accounts and annual returns 'GIFTS FOR ROMANIA'

Charity number: 1067649
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 28 February 2021 21 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 Not Required
Annual return 29 February 2020 15 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2019 09 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2019 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2018 01 February 2019 35 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2018 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2017 23 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2017 Not Required