Accounts and annual returns THE CARDIFF HIGH SCHOOL PARTNERSHIP FUND

Charity number: 1063086
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 17 February 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 23 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 12 October 2020 104 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 12 October 2020 470 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 12 October 2020 835 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 12 October 2020 835 days late Download Open in new window