DISASTERS EMERGENCY COMMITTEE

Charity number: 1062638
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

21 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Gwendolen Hines Trustee 09 July 2021 None on record
Tanya Margaret Anne Steele Trustee 15 July 2020 None on record
Amanda Khozi Mukwashi Trustee 03 April 2018
Demos Received: On time
CHARLES GEOFFREY STEWART-SMITH Trustee 22 March 2017
THE GEORGE MEADOW MILLENNIUM GREEN TRUST Received: On time
Jean-Michel Grand Trustee 10 September 2018 None on record
Frances Ruth Longley Trustee 17 May 2021
JOFFE CHARITABLE TRUST CIO Received: On time
Susan Clare Inglish Chair 20 March 2018 None on record
Peter Barron Trustee 24 March 2021 None on record
Laurie Lee Trustee 18 August 2014
BRITISH GAS ENERGY TRUST Received: On time
Danielle Harvey Trustee 25 November 2019 None on record
Dr Dhananjayan Sriskandarajah Trustee 01 January 2019
GUY'S AND ST THOMAS' FOUNDATION Received: On time
MICHAEL JOHN ADAMSON Trustee 01 September 2014
CATCH 22 CHARITY LIMITED Received: On time
Raja Waseem Ahmad Trustee 17 May 2021 None on record
Jane Hanson Trustee 24 July 2018 None on record
Edith Rose CALDWELL Trustee None on record
MARK ROBERT SHEARD Trustee 09 March 2020
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF SAINT JOHN WITH SAINT JAMES, WEST EALING Received: On time
ANDREW JAMES GREEN Trustee 22 March 2017
WATERAID INTERNATIONAL Received: On time
WWF - UK Received: On time
WATERAID Received: On time
Nigel Harris Trustee 23 November 2015
INTEGRAL ALLIANCE Received: On time
'LEARN TO LOVE TO READ' Received: On time
Laura Elizabeth Kyrke-Smith Trustee 25 November 2021 None on record
Christopher David Roles Trustee 25 March 2015 None on record
Christine Margaret Dench Trustee 11 March 2019 None on record