FOREST COMMUNITY CENTRE (MELKSHAM)

Charity number: 1064323
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 20 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 20 August 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 20 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 20 August 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 21 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018

(These accounts
have been qualified)

21 September 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 11 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

11 December 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 12 May 2017 101 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 12 May 2017 101 days late Download