Financial history FOREST COMMUNITY CENTRE (MELKSHAM)

Charity number: 1064323
Charity reporting is overdue by 176 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £67.31k £52.16k £55.09k £22.16k £49.53k
Total expenditure £64.64k £51.02k £56.76k £19.35k £39.44k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £3.08k N/A N/A £13.00k £14.30k