THE ST GABRIEL SCHOOLS FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1062748
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 07 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 07 May 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2019 31 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 31 May 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2018 24 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 24 May 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2017 10 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 10 April 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2016 02 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 13 April 2017 On time Download