THE ST GABRIEL SCHOOLS FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1062748
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jonathan Frederick Neal Rankin Trustee 03 December 2018 None on record
JANE WHITEHEAD Trustee 20 May 2013 None on record
NIGEL CHARLES GARLAND Chair None on record
SARAH ANNE BOWEN Trustee None on record
SIMON RALPH BARRETT Trustee None on record
Sarah Victoria Hutton Trustee 19 March 2018 None on record
Joanne Margaret Heywood Trustee 01 February 2017 None on record
SEAN RYAN Trustee None on record
Derek John Peaple Trustee 01 June 2016
AGE CONCERN NEWBURY AND DISTRICT Recently registered
COMMUNITY YOUTH PROJECT Received: On time
MICHAEL WILLIAM SCHOLL Trustee
BUCKLEBURY MEMORIAL HALL Received: On time