Trustees BRITISH ORTHOPAEDIC ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1066994
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

19 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Deepa Bose Trustee 01 January 2022
BRITISH LIMB RECONSTRUCTION SOCIETY -BLRS
Overdue by 144 days
WORLD ORTHOPAEDIC CONCERN UK
Received: On time
Professor Andrew Price Trustee 01 January 2022
None on record
Caroline Hing Trustee 01 January 2022
None on record
Cheryl Baldwick Trustee 01 January 2022
None on record
Paul Francis Buckley Trustee 22 September 2021
None on record
Mark Andrew Michael Stephen Leigh Trustee 21 September 2021
None on record
Professor Amar Rangan Trustee 01 January 2021
RED HOUSE SCHOOL LIMITED
Received: On time
BRITISH ELBOW & SHOULDER SOCIETY
Received: On time
Professor Fares Haddad Trustee 01 January 2021
None on record
Hiro Tanaka Trustee 01 January 2021
None on record
Sarah Stapley Trustee 01 January 2021
None on record
Ian McNab Trustee 01 January 2020
None on record
Anthony Hui Trustee 01 January 2020
None on record
Andrew Manktelow Trustee 01 January 2020
None on record
Colin Esler Trustee 01 January 2020
None on record
Fergal Monsell Trustee 01 January 2019
None on record
Deborah Eastwood Trustee 01 January 2017
None on record
Simon Hodkinson Trustee 01 January 2017
None on record
John Skinner Trustee 01 January 2016
None on record
ROBERT HANDLEY Trustee 01 January 2016
None on record