Financial history Servol Community Services

Charity number: 1125896
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £1.73m £2.04m £2.27m £2.49m £2.72m
Total expenditure £1.63m £1.96m £2.31m £2.34m £2.61m
Income from government contracts £1.41m £1.69m £2.22m £2.37m £1.95m
Income from government grants N/A N/A £2.35k £86.62k £86.62k
Income - Donations and legacies £150 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £2.02m £2.22m £2.46m £2.68m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £23.76k £23.84k £41.46k £34.75k £34.02k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.63m £1.96m £2.31m £2.34m £2.61m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £9.34k £0 £15.20k £23.09k £18.57k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0