Servol Community Services

Charity number: 1125896
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
VAL TAYLOR Trustee 03 October 2017 None on record
Laura Claire Bugby Trustee 04 August 2015 None on record
GEORGE BRANCH Trustee 04 August 2014 None on record
LORRETTE HARRIS Trustee 07 September 2012 None on record
John Roberts Trustee 05 December 2017
WRITING WEST MIDLANDS LTD Received: On time