Accounts and annual returns STARTING OUT CHARITY

Charity number: 1064064
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 March 2021 17 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 March 2021 20 September 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 March 2020 03 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 01 March 2019 07 January 2020 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 March 2019 07 January 2020 6 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 March 2018 01 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 March 2018 01 December 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 March 2017 11 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 March 2017 11 October 2017 On time Download Open in new window