Financial history STARTING OUT CHARITY

Charity number: 1064064
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/03/2017 01/03/2018 01/03/2019 01/03/2020 01/03/2021
Total gross income £203.49k £82.50k £48.78k £18.08k £52.08k
Total expenditure £155.72k £65.91k £32.50k £14.49k £42.03k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A