Financial history HINDU TEMPLE NEWCASTLE

Charity number: 1095353
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £148.75k £126.00k £155.75k £134.79k £118.97k
Total expenditure £106.03k £93.35k £123.87k £83.53k £110.38k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £13.01k N/A