Financial history FRIENDS OF HAWKES FARM ACADEMY

Charity number: 1069600
Charity reporting is overdue by 20 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022
Total gross income £24.46k £22.70k £13.76k £1.36k £12.69k
Total expenditure £40.59k £14.18k £21.16k £1.99k £11.38k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A