Financial history CARERS CENTRE SA LTD

Charity number: 1063485
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £769.57k £802.98k £845.00k £910.55k £800.10k
Total expenditure £761.71k £789.94k £901.08k £901.07k £688.45k
Income from government contracts £369.14k £414.57k £363.03k £395.57k £402.25k
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £14.77k £0 £0 £0 £18.14k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £754.47k £802.98k £844.54k £910.35k £781.90k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £333 £0 £458 £197 £66
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £749.27k £789.94k £901.08k £901.07k £675.89k
Expenditure - Raising funds £12.44k £0 £0 £0 £12.57k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0