Financial history THE RUNNYMEDE TRUST

Charity number: 1063609
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £288.36k £329.23k £309.21k £483.90k £1.34m
Total expenditure £266.69k £261.90k £289.90k £402.29k £448.57k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £9.99k £24.55k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £750.74k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £590.52k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £740
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £448.57k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0