Trustees THE RUNNYMEDE TRUST

Charity number: 1063609
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
CLIVE WILLIAM JONES CBE Chair
THE NATIONAL THEATRE OF WALES
Received: On time
Lai-Har Cheung Trustee 16 March 2020
None on record
Dr Iyiola Solanke Trustee 01 October 2019
None on record
Maya Goodfellow Trustee 12 December 2017
None on record
Farah Elahi Trustee 12 December 2017
None on record
Hossein Zahir Trustee 25 September 2017
None on record
Faraz Tasnim Trustee 30 June 2015
None on record
Dr Jason Arday Trustee 18 November 2013
FIRST STAR SCHOLARS UK
Received: On time
Hepburn Harrison-Graham Trustee 18 November 2013
None on record