Financial history CARDIFF THIRD SECTOR COUNCIL (C3SC)

Charity number: 1068623
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £1.59m £1.28m £610.16k £777.91k £1.01m
Total expenditure £1.58m £1.25m £557.11k £701.92k £705.44k
Income from government contracts £1.35m N/A £14.18k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £235.36k £823.07k £128.63k £204.00k £440.04k
Income - Donations and legacies £235.36k £352.71k £394.11k £373.09k £530.84k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.35m £926.67k £215.46k £404.14k £474.09k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £486 £355 £592 £679 £159
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £1.99k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.58m £1.25m £547.65k £701.92k £705.44k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £42.48k £46.97k £22.15k £23.48k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £230.45k £107.83k £201.66k £224.63k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £9.47k £0 £0