ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITY OF THOMAS TROTTER FOR ST. PAUL'S BRAINTREE

Charity number: 1068005
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 23 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 05 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 27 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 31 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 02 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required