AL-ZAHRA WOMEN'S CENTRE

Charity number: 1074719
Charity reporting is overdue by 38 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 15/10/2015 15/10/2016 15/10/2017 15/10/2018 15/10/2019
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £2.91k
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £171
Income from government contracts N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A