JOHN HENRY NEWMAN CHURCH OF ENGLAND ACADEMY SPECIAL BENEFITS TRUST

Charity number: 1079762
Charity reporting is overdue by 30 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £1.78k £1.55k £930 £1.78k £2.70k
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A