Financial history THE MACCLESFIELD MAJESTIC THEATRE GROUP

Charity number: 1072947
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2016 30/11/2017 30/11/2018 30/11/2019 30/11/2020
Total gross income £30.78k £36.06k £22.76k £38.92k £24.20k
Total expenditure £33.09k £40.72k £32.69k £38.89k £23.07k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A