Financial history THE TRAVEL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1065924
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £1.23m £872.19k £732.75k £466.50k £659.01k
Total expenditure £1.28m £1.14m £941.95k £671.90k £577.51k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A £3.50k
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £98.40k £75.52k
Income - Donations and legacies £220.51k £144.07k £127.03k N/A £61.04k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities £993.26k £720.58k £599.56k N/A £508.03k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Income - Investment £5.29k £4.44k £3.07k N/A £686
Income - Other £6.74k £3.10k £3.09k N/A £89.27k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.23m £1.06m £843.85k N/A £507.52k
Expenditure - Raising funds £56.39k £74.78k £98.11k N/A £69.98k
Expenditure - Governance £7.56k £6.23k £8.07k N/A £9.06k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 N/A £0