Trustees THE TRAVEL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1065924
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Helen Marano Chair 15 July 2019
None on record
Dr Susanne Barbara Etti Trustee 17 October 2022
None on record
Georgette James Trustee 23 August 2022
None on record
Dr Megan Keiko Morikawa Trustee 23 August 2022
None on record
Mehmet Semsettin Toprak Trustee 23 August 2022
None on record
Cathy Ritter Trustee 25 January 2021
None on record
Rochelle Turner Trustee 25 January 2021
None on record
Dr Manal Kelig Trustee 25 January 2021
None on record
Jane Frances Ashton Trustee 12 September 2018
None on record
Debbie Hindle Trustee 02 December 2014
None on record