COULSDON CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP TRUST

Charity number: 1064627
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2020 31 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2019 04 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 04 February 2020 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2018 04 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 04 February 2019 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2017 22 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

22 January 2018 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2016 05 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2016 Not Required