PLYMOUTH YOUNG MEN'S CHRISTIAN ASSOCIATION - YMCA

Charity number: 1066919
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £1.59m £1.54m £1.54m £1.53m £1.43m
Total expenditure £1.74m £1.93m £1.63m £1.58m £1.49m
Income from government contracts £130.90k £116.59k £126.71k £127.60k £180.59k
Income from government grants £5.55k £0 N/A N/A £32.43k
Income - Donations and legacies £160.92k £113.47k £101.89k £86.93k £71.41k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £36.02k £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.43m £1.42m £1.43m £1.41m £1.34m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £194 £0 £137 £304 £234
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £11.44k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.69m £1.82m £1.59m £1.54m £1.47m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £43.12k £40.54k £16.58k
Expenditure - Governance £12.54k £12.59k £9.52k £16.40k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £56.18k £0 £0 £0 £1.83k