PLYMOUTH YOUNG MEN'S CHRISTIAN ASSOCIATION - YMCA

Charity number: 1066919
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Arash Dinari Trustee 16 September 2019 None on record
Jeremy Robert Sleet Trustee 24 April 2020 None on record
ANNETTE MARIE STONE Trustee 09 December 2019 None on record
Mary Rose Annette Hibbert Trustee 31 May 2019 None on record
HELEN JAYNE MENEILLY Trustee 09 December 2013 None on record
Tom Buttriss Trustee 10 July 2019 None on record
Jo Greenwood Trustee 16 September 2019 None on record
JOHN COATES Chair 02 April 2013 None on record
David John Warwick Baylis Trustee 02 May 2017 None on record
Rev Lawrence Braschi Trustee 10 May 2021 None on record
Raymond Daniel Leonard Lavis Trustee 31 May 2019 None on record
GRAEME CHARLES CATLING Trustee 03 May 2019 None on record
CHRISTOPHER WILLIAM GOODMAN Trustee 26 September 2012 None on record
HELEN MARY HART Trustee 09 December 2019 None on record