MICHAEL ROBERTS CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1065006
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £174.85k £99.80k £157.79k £169.13k £175.66k
Total expenditure £127.17k £141.82k £141.22k £151.47k £166.24k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £3.00k £3.00k £3.00k £10.00k