THE SOMERSET MILITARY MUSEUM TRUST

Charity number: 1064932
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £3.93k £7.16k £4.62k £11.01k £4.60k
Total expenditure £3.54k £3.58k £2.50k £13.86k £3.82k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A