NORTHAMPTON DOOR TO DOOR SERVICE

Charity number: 1064956
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2020 Overdue Overdue by 146 days
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 Overdue Overdue by 146 days
Annual return 31 October 2019 20 May 2021 262 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 20 May 2021 262 days late
Annual return 31 March 2019 06 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 06 October 2019 On time
Annual return 31 March 2018 16 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 16 November 2018 On time
Annual return 31 March 2017 23 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 23 November 2017 On time