THE FRIENDS OF THE CHURCH OF ST. THOMAS THE APOSTLE, MAMHEAD, DEVON

Charity number: 1100287
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £3.92k £2.21k £2.24k £2.25k £1.98k
Total expenditure £1.03k £0 £2.70k £360 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A