Financial history KILLAMARSH COMMUNITY TRUST (ASSOCIATION)

Charity number: 1065042
Charity reporting is overdue by 164 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £13.41k £12.39k £3.30k £1 £0
Total expenditure £13.80k £15.52k £13.30k £8.30k £7.10k
Income from government contracts £12.00k £12.00k N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A