Trustees KILLAMARSH COMMUNITY TRUST (ASSOCIATION)
Charity number: 1065042
Charity reporting is overdue by 92 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Windle | Trustee | 03 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Barry Jones | Trustee | 04 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Harold Laws | Trustee | 14 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Royden Phillips | Trustee | 11 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
SYLVIA JONES | Trustee | 24 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
COUNCILLOR LILLIAN ROBINSON | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.