Accounts and annual returns BEER PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER AND FRIEND'S ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1064777
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2020 26 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2019 02 September 2020 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2018 02 January 2020 124 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2017 30 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2016 31 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2016 Not Required