Financial history BEER PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER AND FRIEND'S ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1064777
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2016 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020
Total gross income £5.36k £3.10k £3.11k £2.06k £7.05k
Total expenditure £2.40k £3.07k £1.63k £3.23k £2.31k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A