Financial history WEST NILE WELFARE AND DEVELOPMENT ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1098981
Charity reporting is overdue by 137 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £3.58k £4.66k £6.06k £719 £1.26k
Total expenditure £2.76k £3.73k £6.05k £245 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A