Financial history OXFORD CONCERTO ORCHESTRAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 1064982
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £1.90k £1.59k £2.15k £881 £0
Total expenditure £3.48k £1.41k £1.35k £300 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A