Financial history ST IVES SURF LIVESAVING CLUB

Charity number: 1068397
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £34.61k £60.07k £33.89k £33.43k £2.12k
Total expenditure £30.97k £43.44k £40.51k £41.63k £9.26k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £19.66k N/A N/A N/A