ANIMALS IN NEED NORTHAMPTONSHIRE

Charity number: 1068222
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £539.31k £430.34k £355.12k £317.35k £473.50k
Total expenditure £331.66k £316.52k £393.88k £391.68k £361.99k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £495.14k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £34.63k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment £227 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other £9.32k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £143.14k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £135.84k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £52.68k N/A N/A N/A N/A