Financial history THE NATIONWIDE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1065552
Charity reporting is up to date (7 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £3.01m £2.93m £2.57m £2.28m £1.88m
Total expenditure £1.64m £2.39m £3.47m £1.91m £2.32m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £2.85m £2.76m £2.40m £2.16m £1.77m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £49.50k £53.00k £56.83k £27.28k £9.55k
Income - Other £107.45k £111.25k £113.48k £95.78k £99.76k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.64m £2.39m £3.47m £1.91m £2.32m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £75.74k £44.75k £49.82k £44.62k £55.86k
Expenditure - Grants institution £1.10m £1.70m £2.75m £1.32m £1.76m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0